Financial history Three Counties Liberal Jewish Community Ltd.

Charity number: 1159055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £28.17k £31.26k £33.10k £30.19k £42.67k
Total expenditure £21.47k £32.20k £30.92k £27.39k £40.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A