BURNLEY LIGHT OPERA SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide musical/show entertainment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
Governance
- 25 June 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Cheshire | Chair | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Whittaker Mr | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Hardwick | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
CYNTHIA MORRIS J P | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER WOODHEAD | Trustee |
|
||||||
HIS HONOUR RAYMOND BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE WHITTAKER-PEARCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN HARDWICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.53k | £4.51k | £39.58k | £52.95k | £36.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.87k | £7.59k | £53.63k | £47.14k | £49.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 JUNE 1976 AS AMENDED ON 06 MAY 2015 AS AMENDED ON 18 MAY 2023 AS AMENDED ON 20 SEP 2023
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS, (TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE ABOVE CONSTITUTION OF 2 JUNE 1976.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 MARSDEN COURT
BURNLEY
BB10 2SS
- Phone:
- 01282831597
- Email:
- susan.hardwick@ic24.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window