GOD-UNLIMITED OUTDOOR THERAPY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of outdoor activities with therapeutic input to assist those struggling with physical and / or mental health issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 November 2014: CIO registration
- GUL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maggie Collier | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Rollings | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Baud | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Tony Armstrong | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Lt Col Retd David Whimpenny | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Eleanor Claire Walters | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £224.38k | £204.98k | £250.37k | £267.25k | £388.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £205.91k | £195.69k | £242.37k | £263.03k | £348.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.00k | £28.16k | £5.00k | £2.30k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 25 Nov 2014 as amended on 08 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
(1) To provide or assist in the provision of facilities and therapeutic interventions through a network of healthy community and therapy centres for individuals who have need of such provision by reason of their age, ill-health or disability, financial hardship or social circumstances with the object of improving their conditions of life. (2) To advance the Christian faith for the public benefit through the provision of services.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BUSTARD INN
SHREWTON
SALISBURY
SP3 4DU
- Phone:
- 01980621712
- Email:
- office@god-unlimited.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window