GREAT STRICKLAND PARISH INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manages the Village Hall and surrounding open spaces including the adjacent play area for the use and benefit of village residents and visitors
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 09 July 1976: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Burne | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOAN JAMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN TUPLING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.58k | £11.22k | £19.82k | £8.45k | £15.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.20k | £3.31k | £9.35k | £9.60k | £16.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £9.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 25 July 2024 | 210 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 MAY 1975
Charitable objects
THE INSTITUTE HALL IS FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF GREAT STRICKLAND WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GREAT STRICKLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old Midtown
Great Strickland
Penrith
CA10 3DF
- Phone:
- 01931712571
- Email:
- iantupling@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window