Accounts and annual returns KERESTIER

Charity Number: 1158986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 30 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 30 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 12 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 12 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 07 November 2021 07 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 November 2021 07 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 07 March 2022 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 07 March 2022 188 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 10 September 2020 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 10 September 2020 10 days late Download Open in new window