MOTION CONTROL DANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Motion Control Dance enriches lives through movement whilst breaking down barriers and create positive attributes for life. Our vision is to 'advance the education of people all ages, living in the Vale of Glamorgan through provision of dance classes, workshops, and performance opportunities.'
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £20,267 from 4 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 06 May 2015: CIO registration
- MCD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rhys Gareth Lawrence | Chair | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Earon Ashford | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachal Jane Minchinton | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Ashman | Trustee | 12 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.90k | £93.17k | £107.75k | £103.72k | £151.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.48k | £95.78k | £126.57k | £117.90k | £121.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.77k | £45.23k | £47.40k | £30.99k | £20.27k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 06 May 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES, LIVING IN THE VALE OF GLAMORGAN AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, IN THE PERFORMING ARTS, PARTICULARLY THE ART OF DANCE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CLASSES, TRAINING, WORKSHOPS AND PERFORMANCE OPPORTUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ymca
Court Road
BARRY
South Glamorgan
CF63 4EE
- Phone:
- 07725038778
- Email:
- info@motioncontroldance.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window