WILTSHIRE TREEHOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide support to children, young people and their families living in Wiltshire affected by bereavement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 23 December 2014: CIO registration
- 23 June 2023: Funds received from 1181765 THE NICK JONES FOUNDATION FOR BEREAVED CHILDREN
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda McConaghy | Chair | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucas Gleed | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Harris | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Faye Auty | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen Joy Pepler | Trustee | 26 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.51k | £88.48k | £73.83k | £68.69k | £141.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.52k | £58.56k | £82.26k | £83.52k | £90.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Dec 2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL, SPIRITUAL AND PHYSICAL DISTRESS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE RESIDENT IN WILTSHIRE SUFFERING FROM BEREAVEMENT.
Area of benefit
WILTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Westlea Primary School
Langstone Way
Westlea
Swindon
SN5 7BT
- Phone:
- 01793987105
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window