Trustees WELLINGTON HEATH MEMORIAL VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 505294
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kiel Shaw | Chair | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Patricia Mitchell | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Gwendoline Williams | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Anthony Allsopp | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|||||
David James Weller | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|||||
ROY CHRISTOPHER BARNES | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Joseph Sessarego | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Joyce Harrisson | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Susan Mary BARNES | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anthea Cowley | Trustee | 09 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Marco Cowley | Trustee | 03 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.