Accounts and annual returns SHEFFIELD CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE

Charity number: 1159621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 24 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 24 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 04 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 04 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 21 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 21 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 02 August 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 02 August 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window