Governing document Bright Futures Early Learning

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 MAR 2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 MAR 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05 NOV 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 NOV 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND THE SAFE CARE OF CHILDREN BY PROVIDING NURSERIES AND ASSOCIATED FAMILY CHILDCARE SUPPORT AND ADVICE. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE CARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN. C) TO SUPPORT FAMILIES IN RESPECT THEREOF TO HELP THEM PROVIDE EDUCATION AND SAFE CARE FOR THEIR CHILDREN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.