Financial history Trinity Church Central London

Charity number: 1160094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £137.12k £200.35k £119.01k £242.15k £387.07k
Total expenditure £136.22k £165.96k £215.52k £216.41k £237.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A