Financial history SHINING STARS

Charity number: 1160478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £449 £2.33k £1.15k £2.31k £4.93k
Total expenditure £7.14k £1.17k £921 £4.14k £2.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A