DURHAM PRIDE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advocating, raising awareness and educating the public, statutory and non- statutory agencies about the issues and difficulties affecting the lives of Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual and Transgender (LGBT) people. This includes staging an annual LGBT festival and smaller events, including regular social events for the LGBT community and allies in a safe environment throughout the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- Stockton-on-tees
- Sunderland
Governance
- 12 January 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MEL METCALF | Chair | 09 January 2015 |
|
|||||
Thomas Howcroft | Trustee | 31 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Metcalf | Trustee | 31 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Wilkes | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Anne Reeves | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.96k | £79.92k | £100.33k | £96.69k | £117.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.46k | £79.37k | £100.05k | £96.60k | £116.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £27.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.50k | £31.42k | £17.95k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Jan 2015
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND GENDER IDENTITY OF THOSE LIVING IN COUNTY DURHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) ADVOCATE, RAISE AWARENESS AND EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND STATUTORY AND NONSTATUTORY AGENCIES ABOUT THE ISSUES AND DIFFICULTIES AFFECTING THE LIVES OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER (LGBT) PEOPLE; (B) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN PARTICULAR THROUGH CELEBRATING THE DIVERSITY OF THE LGBT COMMUNITY; (C) STAGE AN ANNUAL LGBT FESTIVAL AND SMALLER EVENTS, INCLUDING REGULAR SOCIAL EVENTS FOR THE LGBT COMMUNITY AND ALLIES IN A SAFE ENVIRONMENT THROUGHOUT THE YEAR. (2) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF LGBT PEOPLE IN COUNTY DURHAM, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE LIVING WITH HIV AND AIDS BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Aidans College
Windmill Hill
Durham
DH1 3LJ
- Phone:
- 07462225091
- Email:
- admin@durhamprideuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window