CYLCH MEITHRIN LLANHARI
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide education to pre school children. Offering Welsh and bilingual sessions as well as full day care. Also provide a wrap around service to the local schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Total income includes £90,931 from 4 government contract(s) and £671 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 23 February 2015: Standard registration
- 14 July 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 14 July 2021: Funds transferred to 1181057 FIRST STEPS NURSERY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.14k | £97.96k | £63.69k | £174.55k | £120.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.59k | £86.18k | £107.80k | £131.81k | £121.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £95.04k | £68.52k | £30.88k | £135.55k | £90.93k | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £988 | £5.00k | £671 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 28 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 30 June 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 30 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 30 June 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/10/2014
Charitable objects
A)ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN, BY PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING PLAY AND ACTIVITIES TOGETHER WITH THEIR PARENTS/CARERS WHERE NECESSARY, THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF WELSH. B)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PARENTS/CARERS OF THOSE CHILDREN AND TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION IN GOOD PARENTING SKILLS TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH OF PARENTS AND CHILDREN. C)ARRANGING OTHER CHARITABLE IN ORDER TO HELP PARENTS SUPPORT THEIR CHILDREN'S EDUCATION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window