Accounts and annual returns ELIM TAMIL CHURCH

Charity Number: 1159049
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2017 24 July 2018 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 24 July 2018 24 days late
Annual return 31 August 2016 08 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 08 June 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2015 22 July 2016 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required