Financial history THE PARISH OF SAINT PETER, ACTON GREEN

Charity number: 1159863
Charity reporting is up to date (63 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £96.73k £56.81k £96.31k £95.53k £75.50k
Total expenditure £121.23k £67.15k £62.60k £114.02k £87.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.50k