Financial history AUTISM ANGELS LTD

Charity number: 1160289
Charity reporting is up to date (60 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £175.36k £52.39k £73.78k £115.46k £130.76k
Total expenditure £132.42k £74.32k £83.16k £118.97k £141.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.00k