THE KINETIC SCIENCE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE ARE AN EDUCATIONAL CHARITY THAT HELP THE PUBLIC LEARN ABOUT SCIENCE AND OTHER STEM SUBJECTS. WE PROVIDE AN OUTREACH FACILITY INCLUDING FORENSIC SCIENCE, ASTRONOMY, PHYSICS AND PROBLEM SOLVING AIMED AT CHILDREN. WE NOW HAVE A STEM AND ASTRONOMY CENTRE CALLED IT'S ROCKET SCIENCE. THIS IS A PLACE FOR SCHOOLS AND FAMILIES TO LEARN ABOUT SCIENCE AND USE HANDS-ON EXHIBITS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
Total income includes £39,000 from 4 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- KINETIC ADVENTURE CENTRE (Previous name)
- THE KINETIC SCIENCE FOUNDATION C.I.O. (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Dillon | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacquelyn MacDonald-Fawcett | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarion Bowers | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.37k | £72.08k | £32.63k | £143.43k | £189.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.77k | £76.27k | £42.68k | £51.85k | £208.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.00k | £39.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | |||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | |||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | |||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | |||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 13 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR SCIENCE AND MATHEMATICS AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE SUBJECTS OF SCIENCE AND MATHEMATICS FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING A SCIENCE MUSEUM, SCIENCE EQUIPMENT AND EDUCATIONAL WORKSHOPS FOR CHILDREN AGED 3 - 18 YEARS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 14
Hill View Business Park
Old Ipswich Road
Claydon
IPSWICH
IP6 0AJ
- Phone:
- 01284277122
- Email:
- kineticscience@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window