STUART HALL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities are to advance education for public benefit and to promote the arts for public benefit. The Charity aims to achieve its objectives through the following activities: 1. Developing an international digital presence 2. Awarding scholarships, fellowships and residencies 3. Commissioning new artistic and cultural works 4. Convening a public programm
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 November 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILANE KAMAL KAMEL TAWADROS | Chair | 21 October 2014 |
|
|||||
Martha Awojobi | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Aasiya Lodhi | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Sarah Kavanagh | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Beech Dr | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Farjana Khanom | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Abdul Nasar Meer | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Francis McNeil Greig | Trustee | 03 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maria Amidu | Trustee | 29 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROF Catherine Mary Hall | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paula Kahn | Trustee | 14 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Hall | Trustee | 17 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MICHAEL JULIAN RUSTIN PHD | Trustee | 21 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £301.10k | £290.91k | £150.96k | £170.45k | £90.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £246.62k | £301.90k | £109.31k | £154.25k | £155.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 OCT 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO PROMOTE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY MAKING GRANTS AND AWARDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DAVID WILLIAM BEECH
PRAGER METIS LLP
5A BEAR LANE
SOUTHWARK
LONDON
SE1 0UH
- Phone:
- 07950879835
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window