Accounts and annual returns FRANK BRANSTON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1162156
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 07 March 2025 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 07 March 2025 30 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 19 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 06 February 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 06 February 2023 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 24 March 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 24 March 2021 47 days late Download Open in new window