INTERNATIONAL LIBERTY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
International Liberty Association aims to raise awareness within the British public of the human rights abuses in Iran and the Middle East and at the same time making a real difference in the lives of the victims of such abuses. ILA will also provide facilities and assistance to other groups and organisations involved in promoting human rights in Iran and the Middle East.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income:
£3,243,730
Donations and legacies | £3.24m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £353 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,505,682
Raising funds | £27.27k | |
Charitable activities | £4.48m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £27.27k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.48m |
People

8 Trustee(s)
130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 February 2015: CIO registration
- 14 May 2025: Funds received from 1086150 IMOGEN TAYLOR CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosalind Jane Topping | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|||||
James Edward Lloyd Martin | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ali Nekooi | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hoshang Dookani | Trustee | 11 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM HUGHES | Trustee | 21 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN SARA BECKINGHAM | Trustee | 21 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CLIFFORD WOOD | Trustee | 21 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
FATEMEH OLIYAEI | Trustee | 09 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.29m | £2.59m | £2.81m | £3.07m | £3.24m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.28m | £2.64m | £2.79m | £2.98m | £4.51m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.29m | £2.59m | £2.81m | £3.06m | £3.24m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £212 | £121 | £14 | £51 | £353 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £150 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £10.00k | £10.80k | £0 | £0 | £41.89k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.25m | £2.62m | £2.77m | £2.96m | £4.48m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £33.58k | £23.91k | £25.52k | £23.45k | £27.27k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.68k | £3.85k | £12.76k | £15.16k | £5.20k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £80.50k | £99.26k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £25.28k | £12.90k | £520 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £377.52k | £131.70k | £110.41k | £142.18k | £130.00k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £352.88k | £151.85k | £107.56k | £56.45k | £1.31m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
PROMOTING HUMAN RIGHTS AT HOME AND ABROAD -TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS DEFINED BY THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) INTERNATIONALLY WITH PARTICULAR FOCUS ON MIDDLE EASTERN COUNTRIES BY SUPPORT FOR THE PROMOTION OF THE EQUAL RIGHTS OF WOMEN AND RELIGIOUS OR ETHNIC MINORITIES. - INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS, BY CAMPAIGNING INTERNATIONALLY ON BEHALF OF AND PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS WHO ARE IMPRISONED, EXILED OR BELIEVE THEMSELVES TO BE AT RISK OF IMPRISONMENT, DETENTION, TORTURE OR OTHER CRUEL, INHUMANE OR DEGRADING TREATMENT, OR RESTRAINED BY REASON OF THEIR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CONSCIENTIOUSLY HELD BELIEFS OR THOSE OF ANY MEMBER OF THEIR FAMILY OR PERSON WITH WHOM THEY MAY BE ASSOCIATED, OR BY REASON OF THEIR SEX, ETHNIC ORIGIN, COLOUR OR LANGUAGE. -TO AID REFUGEES WHO ARE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHT ABUSES, WITH THEIR BASIC NEEDS OF LIVING, MEDICAL TREATMENT AND LEGAL EXPENSES OF RELOCATION IN SAFER COUNTRIES. -RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, USING ALL POSSIBLE PUBLIC NETWORK AND COMMUNICATIONS, MEDIA, EVENT, CONFERENCES AT HOME, EUROPE AND UNITED STATE AND OTHER COUNTRIES TO RAISE AWARENESS REGARDING HUMAN RIGHTS VIOLATIONS AND VIOLATIONS OF INTERNATIONAL LAW BY CRIMES AGAINST HUMANITY ESPECIALLY IN MIDDLE EASTERN COUNTRIES. -EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUE IN ORDER TO CONSIDER UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AS THE WAY OF LIVING AT PEACE, KEEPING A DISTANCE FROM EXTREMISM BY PROMOTING TOLERANCE, HUMAN RIGHTS AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY PARTICULARLY AMONG THE YOUNG GENERATION AND YOUTH TO KEEP DISTANCE FROM THE RELIGIOUS EXTREMISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
International Liberty Association
Churchill House
120 Bunns Lane
Mill Hill
London
NW7 2AS
- Phone:
- 02084523481
- Email:
- info@iliberty.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window