Financial history SALTISFORD CHURCH

Charity number: 1159404
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £180.21k £213.79k £192.81k £220.97k £194.17k
Total expenditure £190.71k £211.35k £167.55k £148.86k £156.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A