THE CO-OPERATIVE COLLEGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Co-operative College is an educational charity dedicated to the promotion of co-operative values, ideas and principles within co-operatives, communities and society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 November 2014: CIO registration
- 10 August 2015: Funds received from 1060008 THE CO-OPERATIVE COLLEGE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Jane Darby | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Associate Professor Olufemi Sallyanne Decker | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel John Mark Douglas | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Ann Rainford | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Russell De Villiers | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Thomson | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rose Harvey | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Robert Jardine | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gregory John Roberts PhD | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £639.81k | £462.82k | £302.99k | £414.42k | £340.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.31m | £1.20m | £676.15k | £677.52k | £687.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £11.20k | £12.95k | £5.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £44.52k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £257.27k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £339.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £43.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.25m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £57.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £16.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £17.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 27 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 27 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 06 NOV 2014 AMENDED ON 16/12/2015 AMENDED ON 28 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION AND CONDUCT OF THE COLLEGE FOR THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN A MANNER CONSISTENT WITH THE VALUES AND PRINCIPLES OF THE CO-OPERATIVE MOVEMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Co-operative College
Holyoake House
Hanover Street
MANCHESTER
M60 OAS
- Phone:
- 07529225118
- Email:
- hello@co-op.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window