Financial history PHILLIPS EDUCATION FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1163784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £756.00k £1.15m £609.09k £747.20k £1.15m
Total expenditure £512.76k £1.72m £647.33k £745.86k £684.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £756.00k £1.15m £609.09k £747.20k £1.15m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £3
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £0 £1.72m £604.70k £745.86k £683.94k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £63.93k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £1.72m £604.70k £681.93k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £512.76k £0 £42.63k £0 £598