WALTHAM FOREST FAITH COMMUNITIES FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of religious harmony for the benefit of the public in Waltham Forest by Creating opportunities for dialogue between those of different faiths and beliefs, challenging those who promote or incite religious hatred and to facilitate liaison and where appropriate promote partnership working between individuals or groups of different faith understandings in areas of common concern.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 19 June 2015: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Paul Braham | Chair | 28 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Issop Sulliman Hansa | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Sweden | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Averil Branwen Watan | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Rev Sarah Moss | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Daniel Gates | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tara Khare | Trustee | 30 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
SAIRA MIR | Trustee | 28 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bhavanee Manogaraan | Trustee | 28 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
IQBAL EBRAHIM MEHTAR | Trustee | 02 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Jasmine Danish | Trustee | 02 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £2.70k | £2.00k | £750 | |
|
Total expenditure | £267 | £27 | £2.57k | £2.12k | £323 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 07 OCT 2024
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN WALTHAM FOREST BY: 1 CREATING OPPORTUNITIES FOR DIALOGUE BETWEEN THOSE OF DIFFERENT FAITHS AND BELIEFS, CHALLENGING THOSE WHO PROMOTE OR INCITE RELIGIOUS HATRED AND TO FACILITATE LIAISON AND WHERE APPROPRIATE PROMOTE PARTNERSHIP WORKING BETWEEN INDIVIDUALS OR GROUPS OF DIFFERENT FAITH UNDERSTANDINGS IN AREAS OF COMMON CONCERN; 2 ASSISTING ALL PARTS OF THE COMMUNITY INCLUDING BUSINESSES, COMMUNITY GROUPS, SCHOOLS, COLLEGES, THE STATUTORY SERVICES AND ITS PARTNERS TO ENGAGE MEANINGFULLY WITH FAITH GROUPS AND TO MAKE FAITH GROUPS AWARE OF LOCAL INFRASTRUCTURES WHICH COULD FURTHER THEIR OWN CHARITABLE WORK; 3 RAISING AWARENESS OF RELIGIOUS BELIEFS AND PRACTICES TO ENABLE BETTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN COMMUNITIES THROUGH THE PROMOTION, AND WHERE APPROPRIATE THE DELIVERY OF, FAITH-BASED DEVELOPMENT PROGRAMMES; 4 ADVISING, ASSISTING AND PROMOTING POSITIVE BEHAVIOUR AROUND ISSUES OF FAITH OR BELIEF WITHIN ALL COMMUNITIES; 5 WORKING IN FEDERATION WITH OTHERS TO SUPPORT LOCAL SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND OTHER EDUCATION PROVIDERS TO DELIVER ACCURATE, MEANINGFUL AND APPROPRIATE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION PROGRAMMES; 6 ACTING AS A VOICE AND AN ADVOCATE FOR FAITH COMMUNITIES IN WALTHAM FOREST. 2. THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES WHICH FURTHERS THE CHARITABLE WORK OF FAITH COMMUNITIES OPERATING WITHIN WALTHAM FOREST OR WHOSE MEMBERSHIP INCLUDES THOSE WHO LIVE, STUDY, WORK OR SOCIALISE IN WALTHAM FOREST.
Area of benefit
WALTHAM FOREST
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 SOMERSET ROAD
LONDON
E17 8QN
- Phone:
- 07977212591
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window