URBAN THEOLOGY UNIT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Theological training for ministers and lay people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 15 July 1976: Standard registration
- 19 September 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 19 September 2008: Funds transferred to 1115390 URBAN THEOLOGY UNION
- U T U (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.12k | £189.83k | £95.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.83k | £100.38k | £113.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 19 April 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | 23 April 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 13 April 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | 13 April 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 11 May 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | 11 May 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JUNE 1976. AS AMENDED ON THE 24TH NOVEMBER 1998 AND 20 NOVEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROMOTION OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN MINISTRY IN URBAN COMMUNITIES; (B) THE PROMOTION AND PROVISION OF SCHEMES OF STUDY AND TRAINING INCLUDING COURSES AND LECTURES FOR ORDAINED AND LAY PEOPLE AND OF RESEARCH PROJECTS AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH, DIRECTED AT RELATING CHRISTIANITY TO THE NEEDS AND OPPORTUNITIES OF URBAN COMMUNITIES; (C) THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window