ACTIVE FOR AUTISM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising is mainly carried out by members of the public by charitable events. This also serves to raise awareness of the funding possibilities of the charity to families that previously had no access to this type of funding.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 31 December 2014: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TOM NASMYTH-SHAW | Chair | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lee Stone | Trustee | 20 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
GARETH NASMYTH-SHAW | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
KATY BOOTH | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.15k | £3.54k | £4.26k | £12.68k | £8.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.94k | £7.24k | £8.79k | £9.10k | £11.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 AUG 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN WITH AUTISM SPECTRUM DISORDER AND THEIR FAMILIES, IN SWANSEA AND SURROUNDING AREAS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) ASSISTING IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF CHILDREN WITH AUTISM OR IN NEED OF THERAPY OR REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH DISORDER BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND SERVICES; B) PROMOTING AND PROTECTING THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN WITH AUTISM AND THEIR FAMILIES; C) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE FOR CHILDREN WITH AUTISM AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Bryn Avenue
BURRY PORT
SA16 0SG
- Phone:
- 07745544181
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window