AJK FOUNDATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Main activities of the charity is to improve health and education of people of Kashmir in rural areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Pakistan
Governance
- 01 April 2015: Standard registration
- KHDF (Working name)
- KASHMIR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION LTD (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDUL HAYAT SHAHEEN | Chair | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
NOMAN AKHTER | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
AKHTER MAHMOOD | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
MAHTAB HAFEEZ | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £654 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 JUL 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/07/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/08/2014 as amended on 16 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE OF KASHMIR WHO ARE IN NEED FOR EDUCATION AND SKILLS TRAINING SUCH AS SEWING, KNITTING AND TEACHERS TRAINING BY ESTABLISHMENT OF SCHOOLS AND KASHMIRI HANDICRAFT CENTERS TO PROVIDE FREE SCHOOLING AND SKILLS TRAINING 2) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEF SICKNESS, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF THE PEOPLE OF KASHMIR WHO ARE IN NEED OF CLEAN WATER AND SEWERAGE SERVICES BY SUPPLYING CLEAN WATER FACILITIES AND SEWERAGE SYSTEM TO PROVIDE DRINKING WATER AND SETTING UP SEWERAGE LINES 3) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH FOR THE PEOPLE OF KASHMIR WHO ARE IN NEED OF PRIMARY HEALTHCARE BY ESTABLISHMENT OF HEALTHCARE CENTERS AND RUNNING OF MOBILE AMBULANCE SERVICES TO PROVIDE FREE MEDICAL TREATMENT 4) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE THE GENDER EQUALITY AND EMPOWERMENT OF WOMEN BY ESTABLISHMENT OF ADVICE CENTERS IN RURAL AREAS AND VILLAGES IN KASHMIR TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING ADVICE SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Firefly Close
HAYES
Middlesex
UB3 2FZ
- Phone:
- 07789865903
- Email:
- abdulhayatshaheen@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window