Financial history POTS UK

Charity Number: 1159813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £56.60k £46.78k £70.84k £71.36k £77.16k
Total expenditure £41.94k £34.95k £93.58k £57.04k £47.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A