Accounts and annual returns YEOVIL HEARTBEAT

Charity number: 1160305
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window