GRACE TABERNACLE MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holding regular christian worship services in the community to promote the message of the christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2019
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 28 January 2015: CIO registration
- GRACE TABERNACLE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVE SERGES NGUEM | Chair | 20 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
JACQQUES YOLO | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE NGONGA NZAJI | Trustee | 20 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD NSUELE | Trustee | 20 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.31k | £7.45k | £7.81k | £6.22k | £8.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.51k | £7.16k | £8.26k | £6.78k | £7.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 363 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 363 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 729 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 729 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1094 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1094 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1459 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1459 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 04 August 2020 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 04 August 2020 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 28 Jan 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 ASHBURY PLACE
MANCHESTER
M40 8DX
- Phone:
- 07404619969
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window