ASHTON UNDER LYNE CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly programme of activities open to members of the public including: Two Sunday worship services, monthly free meal for those in need, winter overnight accommodation on Sundays for asylum seekers Monday ? Wednesday Bible Study groups Tuesday ? weekly drop in and games club Thursday ? Friday Coffee shop Friday children?s groups for pre-school with carers, and clubs for 5-16 yrs old
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tameside
Governance
- 05 June 2015: CIO registration
- 21 September 2020: Funds received from 1153140 NEW HOPE ASHTON
- Ashton Church of the Nazarene (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Stephen Morley | Chair | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Nock | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Colin Thomas | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Howcroft | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katy Dawson | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Fisher | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lauren McCann | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Dawson | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian McNeil | Trustee | 05 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.27k | £83.29k | £68.82k | £65.36k | £75.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.43k | £82.20k | £103.15k | £66.49k | £76.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 05 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS PART OF THE CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE INC AND THE DISTRICT PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN NORTHERN ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church of the Nazarene
230 Stamford Street Central
Ashton-under-Lyne
OL6 7LJ
- Phone:
- 07506 215931
- Email:
- revsjm@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window