MEN IN SHEDS (HULL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote social inclusion for the public benefit by preventing men aged 18 or over, within Hull and the surrounding area, from becoming socially excluded and assisting them to integrate into society through the provision of facilities in which they can meet to undertake creative, physical or recreational activities, learn or pass on skills and knowledge, and support each other socially.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 07 April 2015: CIO registration
- MENINSHEDS (HULL) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elinor Chamberlain | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Andrew Bayford | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Watson | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Donna Jackson | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.65k | £2.85k | £24.58k | £31.19k | £72.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.00k | £7.17k | £28.41k | £39.69k | £47.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.00k | £17.56k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 07 Apr 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MEN AGED 18 OR OVER, WITHIN HULL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN WHICH THEY CAN MEET TO UNDERTAKE CREATIVE, PHYSICAL OR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, LEARN OR PASS ON SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE, AND SUPPORT EACH OTHER SOCIALLY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Pavilion
Oak Road Playing Fields
786 Beverley Road
Hull
Hu6 7EY
- Phone:
- 01482803700
- Email:
- info@meninshedshull.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window