PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION OF EAST TILBURY SCHOOLS

Charity number: 1159202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund raising activities to raise money to support and benefit the learning and development of the pupils of East Tilbury Primary school

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £15,664
Total expenditure: £8,470

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Thurrock

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 November 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • EAST TILBURY SCHOOLS PFA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lyndsey Bullman Chair 18 November 2023
None on record
Julie Natasha Kelly Trustee 18 November 2023
None on record
Candice Johnson Trustee 18 November 2023
None on record
Andrea Nicole Hayes Trustee 22 June 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.96k £9.76k £21.99k £17.55k £15.66k
Total expenditure £12.44k £27.76k £13.34k £26.85k £8.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 22 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
East Tilbury Primary School
Princess Margaret Road
East Tilbury
TILBURY
Essex
RM18 8SB
Phone:
07973748048
Website:

No information available