THE SAVIOUR FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATION/TRAINING THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR SAVING OF LIVES THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
- Burkina Faso
- Iraq
- Pakistan
Governance
- 02 July 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALI RAZA RIZVI | Chair | 05 February 2015 |
|
|||||
SYED HASSAN ABBAS RIZVI | Trustee | 23 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD HASAN | Trustee | 23 February 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.64k | £64.06k | £152.81k | £33.73k | £84.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.26k | £91.41k | £150.44k | £59.41k | £76.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 April 2021 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 April 2021 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05/02/2015
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE, WIDOWS, ORPHANS, REFUGEES, VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTERS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF WATER WELLS AND THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHING, AND ACCOMMODATION FOR THE SAID PERSONS; 2. TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROMOTING THE TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF ISLAM, PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORSHIP AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE SHIA ITHNA-ASHRI DOCTRINE; 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR, THE UNDERPRIVILEGED AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS, EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS SCHOOLS, LIBRARIES AND TRAINING CENTRES; 4. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG THE POOR, UNDERPRIVILEGED AND PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, MEDICINES OR GRANTS FOR MEDICAL DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT, OR PROVISION OF HEALTH FACILITIES, SUCH AS HOSPITALS AND CLINICS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Edgehill Road
PURLEY
CR8 2NA
- Phone:
- 07948086317
- Email:
- alirizvi114@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window