LOSTOCK HALL UNITS OF THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 505351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity's main objecitve is the instruction of girls of all classes in the principals of discipline, loyalty and good citizenship.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £2,251
Total expenditure: £9,967

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 July 1976: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • LOSTOCK HALL FRIENDS OF GUIDING (Working name)
  • LOSTOCK HALL GUIDES AND BROWNIES (Working name)
  • LOSTOCK HALL UNITS OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LYNN CAROL CHAMBERS Chair
None on record
MAUREEN JANE ANNE THOMPSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.40k £10.25k £8.02k £4.13k £2.25k
Total expenditure £3.94k £5.24k £3.66k £6.67k £9.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 November 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Girl Guides Association
Moss Street
Lostock Hall
PRESTON
PR5 5BJ
Phone:
07712610873
Website:

No information available