ARABIAN SCHOOL OF GYMNASTICS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the school is to provide gymnastics facilities for children and young people of all backgrounds. The main objective is to advance the education of children and young persons, by ensuring that due attention is given to the development and occupation of their minds and to encourage such persons to participate in gymnastics and other activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 25 November 2014: CIO registration
- 30 October 2015: Funds received from 1081951 ARABIAN SCHOOL OF GYMNASTICS
- ARABIAN SCHOOL OF GYMNASTICS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony John Clark | Chair | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Albert Vincent Bernard | Trustee | 12 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Gibbs | Trustee | 12 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Anne Charlesworth | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Louise Goodin | Trustee | 02 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM HOWTON | Trustee | 02 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £269.28k | £169.77k | £252.14k | £296.08k | £328.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £353.37k | £236.16k | £236.16k | £252.14k | £302.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 November 2024 | 186 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2023
(These accounts |
02 November 2024 | 186 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 October 2024 | 526 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 07 October 2024 | 526 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 June 2022 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 June 2022 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 03 September 2021 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 03 September 2021 | 126 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 25 Nov 2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND TRAINING FOR GYMNASTICS FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 IN MILTON KEYNES AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
MILTON KEYNES AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLETCHLEY LEISURE CENTRE
PRINCES WAY
BLETCHLEY
MILTON KEYNES
MK2 2HQ
- Phone:
- 01908674484
- Email:
- mail@leebrooks.me
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window