Financial history TARKA VALLEY RAILWAY

Charity number: 1162632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £48.38k £59.84k £41.18k £53.33k £48.96k
Total expenditure £41.42k £43.46k £41.71k £27.85k £65.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.40k £2.00k £3.60k £1.75k £2.50k