Accounts and annual returns CHRISTHOUSE BIBLE CHURCH

Charity number: 1161351
Charity reporting is overdue by 654 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 288 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 288 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 26 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 654 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 22 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 17 August 2022 18 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 August 2021 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 19 August 2021 20 days late
Annual return 30 September 2019 29 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 29 July 2020 On Time