ST MARGARET LIFE'S HOPE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a non-profit organisation based in Dorset,dedicated to working with a community in Lamu Kenya. We support,educate and transform the lives of those who need it most, through us we aim to give people the power to overcome poverty,injustice and inequality.Total orphans street children ,young single parents victims of abuse are welcomed regardless of their social background ,gender or religion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
- Kenya
Governance
- 07 November 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET FARMAN | Chair | 07 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Zena Kathleen Farman | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
MIKE DAVIS | Trustee | 07 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALISON DAVIS | Trustee | 07 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.36k | £11.22k | £17.15k | £24.90k | £24.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.50k | £11.81k | £24.63k | £21.50k | £22.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 07 Nov 2014
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND HARDSHIP AMONG ORPHANS AND VULNERABLE CHILDREN IN KENYA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SHELTER, FOOD, HEALTH, EDUCATION AND OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
177 Sopwith Crescent
Wimborne
BH21 1SR
- Phone:
- 07891604501
- Website:
-
stmargaretlifes.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window