DERBYSHIRE MENTAL HEALTH FORUM CIO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Derbyshire Mental Health Forum provides a platform for voluntary agencies delivering mental health services to come together to discuss matters of common interest and to inform and influence strategic planning in mental health. It also directly supports agencies to improve practice and access funding, delivers training and promotes equalities across mental health services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Total income includes £57,639 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 01 December 2014: CIO registration
- 24 January 2020: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 24 January 2020: Funds transferred to 1069838 EREWASH VOLUNTARY ACTION - COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY S...
- DMHF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.97k | £122.86k | £114.33k | £119.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.27k | £109.38k | £114.79k | £72.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £25.00k | £13.75k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £63.59k | £76.36k | £70.14k | £57.64k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 03 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 03 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 04 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 04 December 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 08 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 08 December 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 02 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 02 December 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 01 Dec 2014 as amended on 15 Oct 2019 as amended on 31 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS WORKING IN THE MENTAL HEALTH FIELD BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, INFORMATION, AND CONSULTATION, REPRESENTATION AND LIAISON WITH OTHER BODIES ON RELEVANT POLICIES AND PROGRAMMES AFFECTING THE MENTAL HEALTH VOLUNTARY SECTOR.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window