Trustees CALSTOCK ARTS
Charity number: 1162250

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charmian Elizabeth Anne Saunders | Chair | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Wood | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jane Jackman | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joan Veale | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Penelope Trethowen | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter John White | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Ann Lawton | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANN HENRY | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.