Accounts and annual returns BLURTON FAMILY GROUP

Charity number: 1160498
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 19 January 2024
Accounts and TAR 19 January 2024
Annual return 19 January 2023
Accounts and TAR 19 January 2023
Annual return 19 January 2022
Accounts and TAR 19 January 2022
Annual return 19 January 2021
Accounts and TAR 19 January 2021
Annual return 19 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1635 days
Accounts and TAR 19 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1635 days