Trustees THE BRIGHTSIDE TRUST
Charity number: 1159993

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gordon Montgomery | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tayyeb Shah | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Paul Goodwill | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Ross | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jade Azim | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ben Hunt | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Borm | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Dauncey | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pam Sidhu | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Edmunds | Trustee | 19 January 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.