HEART OF GISSING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Heart of Gissing CIO has developed and runs a Community Centre for the benefit of the inhabitants of Gissing and surrounding villages and promotes education and creative arts for the physical and social wellbeing for all and promotes conservation of the environment. It maintains the Old School and uses any surplus income to award educational bursaries for under 25's and wider community groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- HOG (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Richard Norman | Chair | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Heath | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Bradley-Scott | Trustee | 24 August 2023 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH ANN REYNOLDS | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Reynolds | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Cromley | Trustee | 18 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frances King | Trustee | 18 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Imogen Banham | Trustee | 18 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALAN KING | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD DYKE | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MICHAEL EDDINGTON | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARAH WILLETT | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.40k | £35.47k | £24.98k | £29.22k | £31.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.51k | £24.69k | £21.63k | £31.24k | £22.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.00k | £18.71k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 03 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2023
(These accounts |
03 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 26 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 26 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 11 May 2015
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF GISSING AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (“AREA OF BENEFIT”) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CIO IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS; 2. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE CREATIVE ARTS AND SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED; 3. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND SURROUNDING PARISHES; 4. SUBJECT TO PAYMENT OF THE COST OF MAINTAINING THE OLD SCHOOL PREMISES (INCLUDING THE REPAIR AND INSURANCE OF ANY BUILDINGS THEREON), THE INCOME FROM THE LETTING OF THE OLD SCHOOL PREMISES WHICH IS, IN LAW, PERMANENT ENDOWMENT MUST BE APPLIED IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS: (A) IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO, OR WHOSE PARENTS, ARE RESIDENT IN GISSING, WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: (I) IN AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER OR HIGHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION APPROVED FOR THE PURPOSE BY THE CIO; (II) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF, OR TO PREPARE FOR OR ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE OR SERVICE ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. (B) FOR GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GISSING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gissing Community Building
Rectory Road
Gissing
DISS
Norfolk
IP22 5XB
- Phone:
- 01379677300
- Email:
- admin@heartofgissing.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window