THE JASODA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation endeavoured to provide funds for such charitable causes that would further the objects of the purposes for which the charity was set up. Grants were made directly to support various causes that assist childrens health and education and community centres that help the elderly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 29 December 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MANSUKH PANKHANIA | Chair | 16 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
RAVI PANKHANIA | Trustee | 16 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
BHANUMATI PANKHANIA | Trustee | 16 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
AMAR PANKHANIA | Trustee | 16 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177.13k | £28.93k | £16.39k | £35.61k | £21.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.67k | £8.67k | £12.86k | £45.66k | £750 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 13 April 2023 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 March 2023 | 402 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 14 March 2023 | 402 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 May 2021 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 SEP 2014 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 20 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUITE 1
STANMORE TOWERS
8-14 CHURCH ROAD
STANMORE
MIDDLESEX
HA7 4AW
- Phone:
- 02083857913
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window