BASLOW VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of Baslow Village Hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 15 June 2015: CIO registration
- 03 December 2015: Funds received from 520414 BASLOW VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Plumb | Chair | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Edward Hopkins | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Paul Stunt | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Anne Temple | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Stephanie Dale | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Henry Powell | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Goldsack | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Catherine Osman | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Lorraine Shaw | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julian Newton | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Haynes | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.39k | £22.10k | £24.53k | £11.38k | £21.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.98k | £11.20k | £9.68k | £29.01k | £18.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £20.57k | £13.17k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Jun 2015 as amended on 20 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
1) THE OBJECT OF THE CIO SHALL BE THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE PARISH OF BASLOW AND BUBNELL (“THE AREA OF BENEFIT”) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RACIAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS SUCH USE TO INCLUDE MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE LIFE OF THE SAID RESIDENTS BUT SO THAT THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANNE, BASLOW, SHALL BE PERMITTED TO USE THE VILLAGE HALL FREE OF CHARGE (BUT SUBJECT TO PAYMENT FOR HEAT AND LIGHT) FOR ECCLESIASTICAL AND OTHER PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Baslow Village Hall
Nether End
Baslow
BAKEWELL
DE451SR
- Phone:
- 07876 661325
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window