SHIRWELL SCHOOL OLYMPIC LEGACY TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the pupils of Shirwell School in particular by improving the quality and breadth of physical education and sport provision as a means to promote healthy lifestyles
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 19 January 2015: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Byass | Trustee | 24 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA HELEN GAY | Trustee | 05 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
SIMON ALLEN | Trustee | 05 January 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05/01/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF SHIRWELL SCHOOL FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY IMPROVING THE QUALITY AND BREADTH OF PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND SPORT PROVISION AS A MEANS TO PROMOTE HEALTHY LIFESTYLES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Ellerslie Road
Sticklepath
Barnstaple
EX31 2HT
- Phone:
- 01271850295
- Email:
- admin@shirwell.devon.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window