CHIAROSCURO GLBT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work towards the elimination of discrimination on the grounds of gender or sexual orientation. A GLBTQ friendly community in a Virtual Reality (VR) environment, a safe haven for everyone, where they can relax, meet and interact AT events get support, counselling, friendship and acknowledgement and have their issues put forward, promoting social inclusion and Human Rights.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2020
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Albania
- Algeria
- American Samoa
- Andorra
- Antarctica
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Australia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Bermuda
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Brazil
- British Indian Ocean Territory
- British Virgin Islands
- Bulgaria
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Cayman Islands
- Chile
- Christmas Island
- Cocos (KEELING) ISLANDS
- Colombia
- Cook Islands
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Easter Island
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Equatorial Guinea
- Estonia
- Falkland Islands
- Faroe Islands
- Fiji
- Finland
- France
- Georgia
- Germany
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Greenland
- Guatemala
- Guernsey
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Israel
- Italy
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Jordan
- Latvia
- Liechtenstein
- Luxembourg
- Macedonia
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Malta
- Marshall Islands
- Mauritius
- Mexico
- Monaco
- Montenegro
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Norfolk Island
- Norway
- Panama
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Poland
- Portugal
- Puerto Rico
- Romania
- Samoa
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Singapore
- South Africa
- South Georgia And South Sandwich Islands
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Tajikistan
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Turkey
- Ukraine
- United States
- Uruguay
- Uzbekistan
- Venezuela
Governance
- 24 February 2015: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brenda Davarin | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Scott Mosher | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carole Jean Brown | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
KARL SHEEN | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHANE WESLEY ALDERTON | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2016 | 04/04/2017 | 06/04/2018 | 04/04/2019 | 04/04/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £3.89k | £2.99k | £2.51k | £4.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £3.89k | £2.99k | £2.22k | £3.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days | |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1209 days | |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brynseion Chapel
Heol y Graig
Aberporth
Cardigan
SA43 2HB
- Phone:
- 01239810866
- Website:
-
chiaroscuro-secondlife.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window