Financial history STATE OF TRUST

Charity Number: 1160275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £21.05k £88.92k £77.07k £75.96k £53.95k
Total expenditure £19.07k £31.54k £112.98k £71.71k £84.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £250 £78.92k N/A N/A £22.81k